MI HB5649 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education: curriculum; public high schools to offer a computer science course; require. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1166c.
Title
Education: curriculum; public high schools to offer a computer science course; require. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1166c.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 179 (Y: 87 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2024-06-18 | House | Transmitted |
2024-06-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 179 Yeas 87 Nays 22 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2024-06-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-13 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2024-06-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-06-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-06-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2024-04-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/23/2024 |
2024-04-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2024-04-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-04-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Carol Glanville |