MI HB5651 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
State management: funds; 21st century jobs trust fund; modify. Amends secs. 7 & 8 of 2000 PA 489 (MCL 12.257 & 12.258). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5653'24, HB 5652'24
Title
State management: funds; 21st century jobs trust fund; modify. Amends secs. 7 & 8 of 2000 PA 489 (MCL 12.257 & 12.258). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5653'24, HB 5652'24
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-26 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2024-06-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-06-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-06-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2024-04-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/23/2024 |
2024-04-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business |
2024-04-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-04-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Greg Vanwoerkom |
Same As/Similar To
HB5653 (Same As) 2024-06-26 - Placed On Third Reading
HB5652 (Same As) 2024-06-26 - Placed On Third Reading
HB5652 (Same As) 2024-06-26 - Placed On Third Reading