MI HB5657 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-30 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-30 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; other; Detroit college promise fund; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5001'11
Title
Income tax; other; Detroit college promise fund; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5001'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-05-23 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/23/2012 |
2012-05-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2012-05-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-05-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Lisa Howze |