MI HB5749 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Local government; financing; emergency municipal loan act; modify loan totals, and modify definition of municipality to include school districts. Amends secs. 1 & 3 of 1980 PA 243 (MCL 141.931 & 141.933). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5750'16
Title
Local government; financing; emergency municipal loan act; modify loan totals, and modify definition of municipality to include school districts. Amends secs. 1 & 3 of 1980 PA 243 (MCL 141.931 & 141.933). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5750'16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-11-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2016-07-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/09/2016 |
2016-06-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2016-06-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-06-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Al Pscholka |