MI HB5751 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/27/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/27/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Children; protection; surrender of newborn to a newborn safety device; allow. Amends secs. 5, 7, 10, 17 & 20, ch. XII of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712.5 et seq.) & adds sec. 3a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5750'18
Title
Children; protection; surrender of newborn to a newborn safety device; allow. Amends secs. 5, 7, 10, 17 & 20, ch. XII of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712.5 et seq.) & adds sec. 3a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5750'18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 970 (Y: 98 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 888 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 332 (Y: 94 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 888 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 332 (Y: 94 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 12/27/2018 |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 3:16 Pm |
2018-12-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 970 Yeas 98 Nays 9 |
2018-12-20 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-12-20 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 888 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2018-05-16 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 332 Yeas 94 Nays 14 |
2018-05-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-15 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-05-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-04-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/22/2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2018-03-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-03-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Daire Rendon |