MI HB5778 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax: exemptions; exemption for certain heavy equipment; provide for. Amends 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.1 - 211.155) by adding sec. 9p.
Title
Property tax: exemptions; exemption for certain heavy equipment; provide for. Amends 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.1 - 211.155) by adding sec. 9p.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Ellison [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-05-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/20/2020 |
2020-05-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2020-05-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-05-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Ellison |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-5778 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-5778.htm |