MI HB5797 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-17 - Printed Bill Filed 09/17/2014
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-17 - Printed Bill Filed 09/17/2014
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Labor; fair employment practices; reproductive health coverage information act; create. Creates new act.
Title
Labor; fair employment practices; reproductive health coverage information act; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/17/2014 |
2014-09-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2014-09-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-09-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Gretchen Driskell |
Same As/Similar To
SB1044 (Same As) 2014-09-10 - Referred To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2014-HB-5797 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/House/htm/2014-HIB-5797.htm |