MI HB5859 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-07 - Defeated Roll Call # 282 Yeas 51 Nays 56 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-07 - Defeated Roll Call # 282 Yeas 51 Nays 56 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
School aid: categoricals; learning loss recovery grant program; create. Creates new act.
Title
School aid: categoricals; learning loss recovery grant program; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Alexander [R] | Rep. Luke Meerman [R] | Rep. Daire Rendon [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Griffin [R] |
Rep. Andrew Fink [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 282 (Y: 51 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 282 (Y: 51 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Adverse Roll Call (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 282 (Y: 51 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Adverse Roll Call (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | House | Defeated Roll Call # 282 Yeas 51 Nays 56 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2022-06-07 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 282 Yeas 51 Nays 56 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2022-06-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-05-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-05-25 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2022-05-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/24/2022 |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2022-02-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-02-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Alexander |