MI HCR0005 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-07 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-07 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to urge the United States Congress, Department of Defense, and Department of Veterans Affairs to prioritize research and investment in non-technology treatment options for servicemembers and veterans who have psychological trauma as a result of military service.
Title
A concurrent resolution to urge the United States Congress, Department of Defense, and Department of Veterans Affairs to prioritize research and investment in non-technology treatment options for servicemembers and veterans who have psychological trauma as a result of military service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-07 | House | Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-06-27 | House | Transmitted |
2023-06-27 | House | Adopted |
2023-06-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-06-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2023-06-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Jennifer Conlin |