MI SB0008 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; other; methods for publication of legal notices; modify. Amends sec. 1 of 1963 PA 247 (MCL 691.1051) & repeals secs. 1461 & 1950 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.1461 & 600.1950). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0007'13
Title
Civil procedure; other; methods for publication of legal notices; modify. Amends sec. 1 of 1963 PA 247 (MCL 691.1051) & repeals secs. 1461 & 1950 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.1461 & 600.1950). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0007'13
Sponsors
Sen. Tory Rocca [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 9 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 9 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2013-02-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-02-05 | House | Received On 02/05/2013 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 9 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tory Rocca |
Subjects
Civil procedure, other
Civil procedure, service of process
Communications, internet
Communications, newspapers and magazines
Local government, other
Civil procedure, service of process
Communications, internet
Communications, newspapers and magazines
Local government, other