MI SB0034 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Assigned Pa 0003'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Assigned Pa 0003'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; licensing; concealed pistol licensing boards; eliminate, and transfer duties to the department of state police and county clerks. Amends secs. 1, 2a, 4, 5, 5a, 5b, 5c, 5d, 5e, 5f, 5j, 5k, 5l, 5o & 8 of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.421 et seq.); adds sec. 5x & repeals secs. 5m & 6a of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.425m & 28.426a).
Title
Weapons; licensing; concealed pistol licensing boards; eliminate, and transfer duties to the department of state police and county clerks. Amends secs. 1, 2a, 4, 5, 5a, 5b, 5c, 5d, 5e, 5f, 5j, 5k, 5l, 5o & 8 of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.421 et seq.); adds sec. 5x & repeals secs. 5m & 6a of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.425m & 28.426a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 35 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 (Y: 76 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 5 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 (Y: 76 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 5 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0003'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/4/2015 @ 2:20 Pm |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Approved By Governor 3/4/2015 @ 1:56 Pm |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Presented To Governor 3/4/2015 @ 1:45 Pm |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Roll Call # 35 Yeas 28 Nays 9 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2015-02-25 | House | Returned To Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 Yeas 76 Nays 34 |
2015-02-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-02-24 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2015-02-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-02-03 | House | Received On 02/03/2015 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 5 Yeas 28 Nays 9 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael Green |