MI SB0064 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-22 - Assigned Pa 0155'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-22 - Assigned Pa 0155'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health facilities; nursing homes; patient care policies and compliance procedures; require establishment based on nationally recognized guidelines or best-practice resources and provide other general amendments. Amends secs. 1104, 20104, 20155, 20155a, 21703, 21734 & 21799a of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1104 et seq.).
Title
Health facilities; nursing homes; patient care policies and compliance procedures; require establishment based on nationally recognized guidelines or best-practice resources and provide other general amendments. Amends secs. 1104, 20104, 20155, 20155a, 21703, 21734 & 21799a of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1104 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 382 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 324 (Y: 69 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 306 (Y: 67 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 103 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 324 (Y: 69 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 306 (Y: 67 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 103 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-22 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0155'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/20/2015 @ 4:54 Pm |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/19/2015 @ 9:01 Pm |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/7/2015 @ 3:14 Pm |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Roll Call # 382 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-09-30 | Senate | House Substitute H-3 Concurred In |
2015-09-29 | House | Re-returned To Senate |
2015-09-29 | House | Title Amended |
2015-09-29 | House | Passed Roll Call # 324 Yeas 69 Nays 37 |
2015-09-29 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2015-09-29 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2015-09-29 | House | Rule Suspended |
2015-09-29 | House | Returned As Requested |
2015-09-24 | House | House Requests Return |
2015-09-22 | House | Returned To Senate |
2015-09-22 | House | Title Amended |
2015-09-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 306 Yeas 67 Nays 37 |
2015-09-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-09-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-09-17 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2015-09-17 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2015-09-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-06-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2015-04-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-04-21 | House | Received On 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 103 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Goeff Hansen |
Subjects
Health facilities: nursing homes
Health facilities: patient safety
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Health facilities: patient safety
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs