MI SB0085 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Assigned Pa 0029'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Assigned Pa 0029'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; firearms; definition of pneumatic guns; provide for, and prohibit certain regulations by local units of government. Amends title & secs. 1, 2, 3 & 4 of 1990 PA 319 (MCL 123.1101 et seq.).
Title
Weapons; firearms; definition of pneumatic guns; provide for, and prohibit certain regulations by local units of government. Amends title & secs. 1, 2, 3 & 4 of 1990 PA 319 (MCL 123.1101 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 106 (Y: 79 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 66 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 66 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0029'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/12/2015 @ 5:19 Pm |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Approved By Governor 5/12/2015 @ 10:14 Am |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Presented To Governor 5/8/2015 @ 10:16 Am |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2015-04-29 | House | Returned To Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 106 Yeas 79 Nays 31 |
2015-04-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-04-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-03-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-03-25 | House | Received On 03/25/2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 66 Yeas 29 Nays 8 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Hildenbrand |