MI SB0107 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 169'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 169'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Housing; inspection; inspection procedures and regulations; modify. Amends sec. 126 of 1917 PA 167 (MCL 125.526).
Title
Housing; inspection; inspection procedures and regulations; modify. Amends sec. 126 of 1917 PA 167 (MCL 125.526).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 339 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 291 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-5 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 291 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-5 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 169'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/21/2017 @ 3:32 Pm |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/20/2017 @ 10:32 Am |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/16/2017 @ 3:08 Pm |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-11-01 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-11-01 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-11-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 339 Yeas 102 Nays 6 |
2017-11-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-31 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-07-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-07-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-07-12 | House | Received On 06/22/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 291 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-5 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Substitute S-5 Concurred In |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-5 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-5 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-5 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |