MI SB0157 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Assigned Pa 0008'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Assigned Pa 0008'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; school districts; schools operated by school district with emergency manager; exempt from being placed under supervision of state school reform/redesign officer. Amends sec. 1280c of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1280c). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4214'11
Title
Education; school districts; schools operated by school district with emergency manager; exempt from being placed under supervision of state school reform/redesign officer. Amends sec. 1280c of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1280c). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4214'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 36 (Y: 63 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 31 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 31 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0008'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-03-22 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/16/2011 @ 6:13 Pm |
2011-03-22 | Senate | Approved By Governor 3/16/2011 @ 5:31 Pm |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Presented To Governor 3/16/2011 @ 3:43 Pm |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2011-03-16 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2011-03-15 | House | Returned To Senate |
2011-03-15 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2011-03-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 36 Yeas 63 Nays 47 |
2011-03-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-03-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-03-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-03-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-03-09 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2011-03-09 | House | Rule Suspended |
2011-03-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-03-09 | House | Received On 03/09/2011 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 31 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
Same As/Similar To
HB4215 (Same As) 2011-02-24 - Referred To Committee On Education