MI SB0169 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0236'23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0236'23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Labor: organizations; public employee contact information; require public employers to provide to bargaining representatives. Amends 1947 PA 336 (MCL 423.201 - 423.217) by adding sec. 11a.
Title
Labor: organizations; public employee contact information; require public employers to provide to bargaining representatives. Amends 1947 PA 336 (MCL 423.201 - 423.217) by adding sec. 11a.
Sponsors
Sen. John Cherry [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 567 (Y: 56 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 337 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 337 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-29 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0236'23 |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/30/2023 10:04 Am |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/29/2023 05:00 Pm |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/27/2023 02:34 Pm |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-11-09 | House | Returned To Senate |
2023-11-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 567 Yeas 56 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2023-11-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-11-09 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-11-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-11-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-06-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Labor |
2023-06-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-06-08 | House | Received On 06/08/2023 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 337 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Labor |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Cherry |
2023-11-09 | House | Read A Third Time |