MI SB0173 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - For Final Disposition Of Budget, See Hb 4526
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - For Final Disposition Of Budget, See Hb 4526
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; department of corrections; provide for fiscal year 2011-2012. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; department of corrections; provide for fiscal year 2011-2012. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Sen. John Proos [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 248 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 152 (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 109 (Y: 62 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 101 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 152 (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 109 (Y: 62 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 101 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Senate | For Final Disposition Of Budget, See Hb 4526 |
2011-05-26 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2011-05-26 | House | Conference Report Received |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 248 Yeas 22 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Conference Report Received In Senate |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Referred To Conference Committee 05/12/2011 |
2011-05-12 | House | House Conferees Named 05/12/2011: Reps. Joe Haveman Greg Macmaster Steven Lindberg |
2011-05-12 | House | Senate Conferees Named 05/12/2011: Sens. John Proos Roger Kahn Glenn Anderson |
2011-05-12 | House | Re-received From Senate With Notice Of Nonconcurrence In House Substitute H-1 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Senate Named Conferees 05/12/2011: Sens. John Proos, Roger Kahn, Glenn Anderson |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Roll Call # 152 Yeas 0 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Nonconcurred In |
2011-05-12 | Senate | House Amended Title |
2011-05-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2011-05-12 | House | Title Amended |
2011-05-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 109 Yeas 62 Nays 46 |
2011-05-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-05-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-05-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-05-12 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2011-05-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-05-11 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2011-05-11 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2011-05-10 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2011-04-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2011-04-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-04-27 | House | Received On 04/26/2011 |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 101 Yeas 23 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |