MI SB0173 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-17 - Re-referred To Committee On Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-17 - Re-referred To Committee On Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School aid; payments; payment of work project allocation for costs associated with certain dissolved school districts and calculation of state portion of foundation allowance for certain receiving districts; revise. Amends secs. 11, 11r, 20, 20g & 22a of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1611 et seq.).
Title
School aid; payments; payment of work project allocation for costs associated with certain dissolved school districts and calculation of state portion of foundation allowance for certain receiving districts; revise. Amends secs. 11, 11r, 20, 20g & 22a of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1611 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 64 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 64 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-17 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2015-06-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-06-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2015-03-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-03-25 | House | Received On 03/25/2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 64 Yeas 29 Nays 8 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Substitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ken Horn |
Subjects
Appropriations: supplemental
Education: financing
Education: reorganization
Education: school districts
School aid: categoricals
School aid: foundation allowance
School aid: payments
School aid: supplemental
Education: financing
Education: reorganization
Education: school districts
School aid: categoricals
School aid: foundation allowance
School aid: payments
School aid: supplemental