MI SB0236 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0065'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0065'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: criminal sexual conduct; definition of mentally incapacitated for criminal sexual conduct cases; modify. Amends sec. 520a of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.520a).
Title
Crimes: criminal sexual conduct; definition of mentally incapacitated for criminal sexual conduct cases; modify. Amends sec. 520a of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.520a).
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Irwin [D] | Sen. Rosemary Bayer [D] | Sen. Erika Geiss [D] | Sen. Sylvia Santana [D] |
Sen. Dayna Polehanki [D] | Sen. Stephanie Chang [D] | Sen. Ed McBroom [R] | Sen. Ruth Johnson [R] |
Sen. Samir Singh [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 201 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 143 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 143 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-18 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0065'23 With Immediate Effect |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/12/2023 10:22 Am |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Approved By Governor 07/11/2023 12:50 Pm |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Presented To Governor 07/06/2023 02:16 Pm |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2023-06-21 | House | Returned To Senate |
2023-06-21 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2023-06-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 201 Yeas 105 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2023-06-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-06-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-06-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-06-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-06-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-05-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2023-05-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-03 | House | Received On 05/03/2023 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 143 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jeff Irwin |