MI SB0237 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Placed On Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Placed On Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Use tax: definitions; data center equipment used by an enterprise data center; exempt. Amends sec. 4cc of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.94cc).
Title
Use tax: definitions; data center equipment used by an enterprise data center; exempt. Amends sec. 4cc of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.94cc).
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Hertel [D] | Sen. Joseph Bellino [R] | Sen. Roger Victory [R] | Sen. Paul Wojno [D] |
Sen. Veronica Klinefelt [D] | Sen. Sylvia Santana [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 142 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-5 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-5 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2024-05-14 | House | Rule Suspended |
2024-05-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-05-09 | House | Received On 05/09/2024 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 142 Yeas 24 Nays 11 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-11) As Amended |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Substitute (s-11) As Amended Concurred In |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-11) And Amendment(s) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-5) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-5) |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kevin Hertel |