MI SB0251 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-25 - Assigned Pa 0203'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-25 - Assigned Pa 0203'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; statute of limitations; certain crimes relating to real property; revise statute of limitations. Amends sec. 24, ch. VII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 767.24).
Title
Criminal procedure; statute of limitations; certain crimes relating to real property; revise statute of limitations. Amends sec. 24, ch. VII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 767.24).
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Nofs [R] | Sen. Randy Richardville [R] | Sen. James Marleau [R] | Sen. Darwin Booher [R] |
Sen. John Pappageorge [R] | Sen. Tupac Hunter [D] | Sen. Goeff Hansen [R] | Sen. Tory Rocca [R] |
Sen. John Gleason [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-10-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 387 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Banking And Financial Services (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 284 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Banking And Financial Services (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 284 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-25 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0203'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/20/2011 @ 4:19 Pm |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/20/2011 @ 12:44 Pm |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/17/2011 @ 4:04 Pm |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Immediate Effect Postponed |
2011-10-06 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2011-10-05 | House | Returned To Senate |
2011-10-05 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2011-10-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 387 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2011-10-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-10-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-10-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-09-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-09-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-09-08 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2011-09-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Banking And Financial Services |
2011-06-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-06-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-06-14 | House | Received On 06/14/2011 |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 284 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions |
Subjects
Crimes, forgery
Crimes, fraud
Crimes, other
Crimes, uttering and publishing
Criminal procedure, statute of limitations
Property, conveyances
Crimes, fraud
Crimes, other
Crimes, uttering and publishing
Criminal procedure, statute of limitations
Property, conveyances