MI SB0251 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Assigned Pa 0070'24 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Assigned Pa 0070'24 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation: carriers; motor bus transportation act; modify the display of identification requirements. Amends sec. 15 of 1982 PA 432 (MCL 474.115).
Title
Transportation: carriers; motor bus transportation act; modify the display of identification requirements. Amends sec. 15 of 1982 PA 432 (MCL 474.115).
Sponsors
Sen. Erika Geiss [D] | Sen. Ed McBroom [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 251 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 162 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 325 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 162 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 325 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0070'24 With Immediate Effect |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/08/2024 01:08 Pm |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 07/08/2024 09:32 Am |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 06/26/2024 03:04 Pm |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 251 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-20 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2024-06-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2024-06-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2024-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 162 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-11 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2024-06-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-09-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-09-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-06-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure |
2023-06-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-06-07 | House | Received On 06/07/2023 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 325 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Erika Geiss |