MI SB0277 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-13 - Assigned Pa 0248'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-13 - Assigned Pa 0248'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; other; NREPA programs; require service surveys, process review, and metrics. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding pt. 27.
Title
Environmental protection; other; NREPA programs; require service surveys, process review, and metrics. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding pt. 27.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 480 (Y: 93 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 479 (Y: 94 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 135 (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 479 (Y: 94 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 135 (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-13 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0248'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/8/2011 @ 2:51 Pm |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/8/2011 @ 10:36 Am |
2011-12-07 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/6/2011 @ 1:48 Pm |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2011-11-29 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2011-11-10 | House | Returned To Senate |
2011-11-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 480 Yeas 93 Nays 14 |
2011-11-10 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2011-11-10 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2011-11-10 | House | Passed Roll Call # 479 Yeas 94 Nays 12 |
2011-11-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-11-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-11-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-11-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-11-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-05-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2011-05-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-05-05 | House | Received On 05/05/2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 135 Yeas 29 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |