MI SB0283 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-18 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-18 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance; contributions and expenditures; annual signature requirement for political action committees checkoff for payroll deductions; eliminate. Amends sec. 55 of 1976 PA 388 (MCL 169.255).
Title
Campaign finance; contributions and expenditures; annual signature requirement for political action committees checkoff for payroll deductions; eliminate. Amends sec. 55 of 1976 PA 388 (MCL 169.255).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 210 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 210 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-06-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-05-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2013-05-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-22 | House | Received On 05/22/2013 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 210 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Arlan Meekhof |