MI SB0284 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - Assigned Pa 0095'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - Assigned Pa 0095'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public utilities; other; creation and funding of the low-income energy assistance fund; provide for. Amends 1939 PA 3 (MCL 460.1 - 460.11) by adding sec. 9t.
Title
Public utilities; other; creation and funding of the low-income energy assistance fund; provide for. Amends 1939 PA 3 (MCL 460.1 - 460.11) by adding sec. 9t.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 276 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 276 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 234 (Y: 86 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 169 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 276 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 234 (Y: 86 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 169 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0095'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/1/2013 @ 3:39 Pm |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 7/1/2013 @ 3:09 Pm |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/26/2013 @ 11:22 Am |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Roll Call # 276 Yeas 34 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2013-06-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2013-06-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 234 Yeas 86 Nays 21 |
2013-06-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-06-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-06-12 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2013-06-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-06-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-06-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-05-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2013-05-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-14 | House | Received On 05/14/2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 169 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Mike Nofs |
Subjects
Public utilities, electric utilities
Public utilities, other
Public utilities, public service commission
Public utilities, other
Public utilities, public service commission