MI SB0306 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Assigned Pa 0091'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Assigned Pa 0091'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; other; definition of assessable property in the principal shopping district act; revise. Amends secs. 1, 5, 10, 10b, 10c, 10e, 10f, 10g, 10h, 10j, 10k & 10l of 1961 PA 120 (MCL 125.981 et seq.).
Title
Economic development; other; definition of assessable property in the principal shopping district act; revise. Amends secs. 1, 5, 10, 10b, 10c, 10e, 10f, 10g, 10h, 10j, 10k & 10l of 1961 PA 120 (MCL 125.981 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 164 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 223 (Y: 91 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 311 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 223 (Y: 91 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 311 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0091'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/16/2020 01:19 Pm |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Approved By Governor 06/16/2020 11:35 Am |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Presented To Governor 06/10/2020 12:55 Pm |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 164 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-06-03 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-06-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 223 Yeas 91 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-06-03 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-06-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
2019-11-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-11-20 | House | Received On 11/13/2019 |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 311 Yeas 31 Nays 5 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter Macgregor |