MI SB0309 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 0005'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 0005'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation: other; trucks used for towing and recovery operations; assess fees under the motor carrier act. Amends secs. 2 & 8, art. IV of 1933 PA 254 (MCL 478.2 & 478.8).
Title
Transportation: other; trucks used for towing and recovery operations; assess fees under the motor carrier act. Amends secs. 2 & 8, art. IV of 1933 PA 254 (MCL 478.2 & 478.8).
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 3 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 191 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 191 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0005'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 01/27/2020 03:02 Pm |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 01/24/2020 10:39 Am |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Presented To Governor 01/14/2020 10:30 Am |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-01-08 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-01-08 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-01-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 3 Yeas 105 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-01-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-12-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-11-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-09-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-09-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-09-04 | House | Received On 09/04/2019 |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 191 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dale Zorn |