MI SB0321 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-29 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-29 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education: teachers; development or adoption of professional development standards for teachers on mental health first aid; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1526b.
Title
Education: teachers; development or adoption of professional development standards for teachers on mental health first aid; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1526b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 355 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2021-09-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-09-29 | House | Received On 09/29/2021 |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 355 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Sylvia Santana |