MI SB0352 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-13 - Assigned Pa 0161'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-13 - Assigned Pa 0161'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; exemptions; principal residence of disabled veterans; exempt. Amends sec. 7b of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.7b).
Title
Property tax; exemptions; principal residence of disabled veterans; exempt. Amends sec. 7b of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.7b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 449 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-10-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 352 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 211 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 352 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 211 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-13 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0161'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/12/2013 @ 4:05 Pm |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/12/2013 @ 3:40 Pm |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/31/2013 @ 12:04 Pm |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2013-10-24 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 449 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2013-10-24 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2013-10-23 | House | Returned To Senate |
2013-10-23 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2013-10-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 352 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2013-10-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-10-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-10-22 | House | Amended |
2013-10-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-06-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-05-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2013-05-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-22 | House | Received On 05/22/2013 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 211 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Hildenbrand |