MI SB0352 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-31 - Assigned Pa 0137'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-31 - Assigned Pa 0137'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health; education; training program and written clearance form regarding concussions in youth athletes and their return to athletic activity; specify frequency of training and modify definition of youth athlete. Amends secs. 9155 & 9156 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.9155 & 333.9156).
Title
Health; education; training program and written clearance form regarding concussions in youth athletes and their return to athletic activity; specify frequency of training and modify definition of youth athlete. Amends secs. 9155 & 9156 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.9155 & 333.9156).
Sponsors
Sen. John Proos [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-10-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 291 (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 251 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 251 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0137'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/26/2017 @ 2:26 Pm |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/26/2017 @ 11:58 Am |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/16/2017 @ 11:18 Am |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-10-05 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-10-05 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-10-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 291 Yeas 104 Nays 4 |
2017-10-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-09-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-09-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-06-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-06-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-06-15 | House | Received On 06/14/2017 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 251 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Proos |
Subjects
Education: athletics
Health: children
Health: education
Recreation: athletics and sports
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Health: children
Health: education
Recreation: athletics and sports
State agencies (existing): health and human services