MI SB0356 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0350'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0350'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; animals; forfeiture of real property used in the commission of animal fighting; allow. Amends sec. 4702 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.4702).
Title
Crimes; animals; forfeiture of real property used in the commission of animal fighting; allow. Amends sec. 4702 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.4702).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-11-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 594 (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 466 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 466 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0350'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/13/2012 @ 1:12 Pm |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/12/2012 @ 8:00 Pm |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/4/2012 @ 12:44 Pm |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-11-29 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-11-27 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-11-27 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-11-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 594 Yeas 101 Nays 7 |
2012-11-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-02-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-02-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-01-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-01-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-09-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-09-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-09-07 | House | Received On 09/07/2011 |
2011-09-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 466 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |