MI SB0415 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 0168'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 0168'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agriculture; other; security measures to combat credit card skimmers; require on retail motor fuel pumps with scanning devices. Amends 1964 PA 283 (MCL 290.601 - 290.635) by adding sec. 28f.
Title
Agriculture; other; security measures to combat credit card skimmers; require on retail motor fuel pumps with scanning devices. Amends 1964 PA 283 (MCL 290.601 - 290.635) by adding sec. 28f.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 336 (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 320 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 320 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0168'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/21/2017 @ 3:30 Pm |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/20/2017 @ 10:38 Am |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/16/2017 @ 3:14 Pm |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-10-31 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-10-31 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-10-31 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 336 Yeas 101 Nays 5 |
2017-10-31 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-07-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2017-07-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-07-12 | House | Received On 06/28/2017 |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 320 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt |
Subjects
Agriculture: other
Consumer credit: credit cards
Consumer protection: other
Trade: data security
Transportation: other
Consumer credit: credit cards
Consumer protection: other
Trade: data security
Transportation: other