MI SB0420 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Pa 0059'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Pa 0059'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children; protection; considerations for returning child to custody of parent; modify. Amends secs. 2 & 18 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.622 & 722.638).
Title
Children; protection; considerations for returning child to custody of parent; modify. Amends secs. 2 & 18 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.622 & 722.638).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 98 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 84 (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 468 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 84 (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 468 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0059'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/14/2018 @ 1:06 Pm |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Approved By Governor 3/13/2018 @ 11:52 Am |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 3/1/2018 @ 2:05 Pm |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Roll Call # 98 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2018-02-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 84 Yeas 103 Nays 5 |
2018-02-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-02-15 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2018-02-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-30 | House | Received On 11/30/2017 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 468 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Phillip Pavlov |