MI SB0433 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - Reassigned To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - Reassigned To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Children: services; reference to "children's ombudsman" in social welfare act; amend to "child advocate". Amends sec. 115m of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.115m). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0432'23
Title
Children: services; reference to "children's ombudsman" in social welfare act; amend to "child advocate". Amends sec. 115m of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.115m). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0432'23
Sponsors
Sen. Ruth Johnson [R] | Sen. Jeff Irwin [D] | Sen. Paul Wojno [D] | Sen. Rosemary Bayer [D] |
Sen. Roger Victory [R] | Sen. Sue Shink [D] | Sen. Erika Geiss [D] | Sen. Sylvia Santana [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-10-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-11 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ruth Johnson |
Same As/Similar To
SB0432 (Same As) 2023-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0303'23