MI SB0462 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0161'21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0161'21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marihuana: licenses; approval of an application for a state license; make contingent upon licensee's compliance with financial responsibility requirements. Amends sec. 402 of 2016 PA 281 (MCL 333.27402). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0461'21
Title
Medical marihuana: licenses; approval of an application for a state license; make contingent upon licensee's compliance with financial responsibility requirements. Amends sec. 402 of 2016 PA 281 (MCL 333.27402). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0461'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 500 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 617 (Y: 94 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 332 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 617 (Y: 94 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 332 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0161'21 |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2021 12:56 Pm |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/23/2021 10:44 Am |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/16/2021 03:56 Pm |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 500 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2021-12-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2021-12-14 | House | Title Amended |
2021-12-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 617 Yeas 94 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2021-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-12-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-12-14 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-12-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-12-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-11-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-11-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-07-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-07-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-07-21 | House | Received On 07/15/2021 |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 332 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Paul Wojno |