MI SB0468 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Assigned Pa 0059'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Assigned Pa 0059'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; violations; receiving, reading, or sending a text message while operating a motor vehicle; prohibit under certain circumstances and provide penalties. Amends sec. 732 & 907 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.732 & 257.907). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4370'09, HB 4394'09
Title
Traffic control; violations; receiving, reading, or sending a text message while operating a motor vehicle; prohibit under certain circumstances and provide penalties. Amends sec. 732 & 907 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.732 & 257.907). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4370'09, HB 4394'09
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Assigned Pa 0059'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-05-04 | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/30/2010 @ 1:02 Pm | |
2010-05-04 | Approved By Governor 4/30/2010 @ 8:47 Am | |
2010-05-04 | Presented To Governor 4/29/2010 @ 12:03 Pm | |
2010-04-29 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-04-28 | Re-returned To Senate | |
2010-04-28 | Title Amendment Agreed To | |
2010-04-28 | Roll Call # 156 Yeas 82 Nays 22 | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Amendment(s) To House Substitute H-1 Concurred In | |
2010-04-27 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | |
2010-04-27 | Re-returned From Senate With Amendment(s) To House Substitute H-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment | |
2010-04-27 | Title Amended | |
2010-04-27 | Title Amendment Agreed To | |
2010-04-27 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-04-27 | Roll Call # 208 Yeas 26 Nays 10 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-04-27 | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In As Amended | |
2010-04-27 | Amendment(s) Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | House Amended Title | |
2010-04-21 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Title Amended | |
2010-04-21 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 149 Yeas 89 Nays 19 | |
2010-04-21 | Amended | |
2010-04-20 | Postponed For The Day | |
2010-04-20 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-04-20 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-04-20 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-04-20 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-03-18 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2010-01-26 | Referred To Committee On Transportation | |
2010-01-26 | Read A First Time | |
2010-01-26 | Received On 01/26/2010 | |
2010-01-26 | Passed Roll Call # 18 Yeas 31 Nays 6 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-01-26 | Amendment(s) Defeated | |
2009-12-17 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-4 | |
2009-12-17 | Substitute S-4 Concurred In | |
2009-12-17 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-4 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-12-09 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-12-09 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-04-23 | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
Subjects
Communications, cellular telephone
Traffic control, civil infraction procedures
Traffic control, violations
Traffic control, civil infraction procedures
Traffic control, violations