MI SB0482 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children; foster care; keeping siblings together in foster care placements; require under certain conditions. Amends secs. 2 & 4a of 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.952 & 722.954a). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0483'15
Title
Children; foster care; keeping siblings together in foster care placements; require under certain conditions. Amends secs. 2 & 4a of 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.952 & 722.954a). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0483'15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 554 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-12-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-12-08 | House | Received On 12/08/2015 |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 554 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |