MI SB0485 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-01 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-01 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health; death; unclaimed body program; require department of community health to establish. Amends secs. 2652, 2653, 2655, 2656, 2658 & 2659 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2652 et seq.) & adds sec. 2652a.
Title
Health; death; unclaimed body program; require department of community health to establish. Amends secs. 2652, 2653, 2655, 2656, 2658 & 2659 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2652 et seq.) & adds sec. 2652a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 594 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-09-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2014-10-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-10-01 | House | Received On 10/01/2014 |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 594 Yeas 28 Nays 8 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Bruce Caswell |
Same As/Similar To
HB4990 (Same As) 2013-09-18 - Printed Bill Filed 09/18/2013
Subjects
Cemeteries and funerals, burial or cremation
Health, death
Health, vital records
State agencies (existing), community health
Health, death
Health, vital records
State agencies (existing), community health