MI SB0495 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services
Pending: House Insurance And Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services
Pending: House Insurance And Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: fraternal benefit societies; liquidation and rehabilitation procedures; modify. Amends sec. 8182 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.8182) & adds secs. 8199b & 8199c.
Title
Insurance: fraternal benefit societies; liquidation and rehabilitation procedures; modify. Amends sec. 8182 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.8182) & adds secs. 8199b & 8199c.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 257 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services |
2024-06-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-06-20 | House | Received On 06/20/2024 |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 257 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dan Lauwers |