MI SB0511 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-02 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-02 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax; other; department of history, arts, and libraries; eliminate references. Amends sec. 4cc of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.54cc). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0503'09
Title
Sales tax; other; department of history, arts, and libraries; eliminate references. Amends sec. 4cc of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.54cc). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0503'09
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Allen [R] | Sen. Patricia Birkholz [R] | Sen. Cameron Brown [R] | Sen. Ronald Jelinek [R] |
Sen. Wayne Kuipers [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-02 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-09-02 | Read A First Time | |
2009-09-02 | Received On 08/27/2009 | |
2009-08-27 | Passed Roll Call # 425 Yeas 21 Nays 14 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-08-27 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-08-27 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-08-27 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2009-08-27 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-08-27 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2009-08-27 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-08-27 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2009-04-30 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
Subjects
History and arts, other
Sales tax, other
State agencies (existing), history, arts, and libraries
State agencies (existing), state
Sales tax, other
State agencies (existing), history, arts, and libraries
State agencies (existing), state