MI SB0568 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education: other; certain requirements for the approval of teacher preparation institutions; create. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1531e. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0567'23, HB 5098'23
Title
Education: other; certain requirements for the approval of teacher preparation institutions; create. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1531e. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0567'23, HB 5098'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 54 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2024-03-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-03-12 | House | Received On 03/12/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 54 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2023-10-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2023-10-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dayna Polehanki |
Same As/Similar To
SB0567 (Same As) 2024-03-12 - Referred To Committee On Education
HB5098 (Same As) 2023-10-10 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/05/2023
HB5098 (Same As) 2023-10-10 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/05/2023
Subjects
Education: other
Education: school districts
Education: special education
Education: students
Health: children
Education: school districts
Education: special education
Education: students
Health: children