MI SB0624 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - Assigned Pa 0150'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - Assigned Pa 0150'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: annuities; determining minimum nonforfeiture amounts; modify. Amends sec. 4072 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.4072).
Title
Insurance: annuities; determining minimum nonforfeiture amounts; modify. Amends sec. 4072 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.4072).
Sponsors
Sen. Lana Theis [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 334 (Y: 102 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 433 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 433 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0150'22 |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/19/2022 12:00 Pm |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Approved By Governor 07/19/2022 09:38 Am |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Presented To Governor 07/07/2022 11:12 Am |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-06-30 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-06-30 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2022-06-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 334 Yeas 102 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-06-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-06-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-05-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-05-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2021-11-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-11-10 | House | Received On 11/10/2021 |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 433 Yeas 34 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Banking |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Lana Theis |