MI SB0689 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Assigned Pa 0003'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Assigned Pa 0003'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health; pharmaceuticals; limitations on dispensing schedule 2 controlled substances; revise to allow more than 1 on single prescription form and allow dispensing up to 90 days after date prescription is issued. Amends sec. 7333 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7333).
Title
Health; pharmaceuticals; limitations on dispensing schedule 2 controlled substances; revise to allow more than 1 on single prescription form and allow dispensing up to 90 days after date prescription is issued. Amends sec. 7333 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7333).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | Assigned Pa 0003'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-02-09 | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/4/2010 @ 10:04 Am | |
2010-02-09 | Approved By Governor 2/3/2010 @ 5:35 Pm | |
2010-01-26 | Presented To Governor 1/22/2010 @ 3:44 Pm | |
2010-01-20 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-01-20 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-01-20 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-01-20 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-01-19 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-01-19 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-01-19 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 2 Yeas 107 Nays 1 | |
2010-01-19 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-01-19 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-01-19 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-01-19 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-10-20 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-10-20 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-09-17 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | |
2009-09-17 | Read A First Time | |
2009-09-17 | Received On 09/17/2009 | |
2009-09-17 | Passed Roll Call # 458 Yeas 33 Nays 0 Excused 4 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-09-17 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-09-17 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-09-17 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-09-17 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2009-09-17 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-09-17 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-09-17 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-09-17 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-07-15 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |