MI SB0694 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - Referred To Committee On Ethics And Elections
Pending: House Ethics And Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - Referred To Committee On Ethics And Elections
Pending: House Ethics And Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; offenses; penalties for illegal or fraudulent vote registration; increase. Amends sec. 519 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.519).
Title
Elections; offenses; penalties for illegal or fraudulent vote registration; increase. Amends sec. 519 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.519).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-12-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Referred To Committee On Ethics And Elections | |
2010-03-03 | Read A First Time | |
2010-03-03 | Received On 03/03/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Passed Roll Call # 78 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-03-02 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 | |
2010-03-02 | Substitute S-3 Concurred In | |
2010-03-02 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 | |
2009-12-10 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 | |
2009-12-10 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-12-10 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 | |
2009-07-15 | Referred To Committee On Campaign And Election Oversight |