MI SB0738 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Assigned Pa 0145'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Assigned Pa 0145'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; pension oversight; executive summary of annual valuation reports on pension and retiree health care for state unit systems; require. Amends sec. 13 of 1965 PA 314 (MCL 38.1133).
Title
Retirement; pension oversight; executive summary of annual valuation reports on pension and retiree health care for state unit systems; require. Amends sec. 13 of 1965 PA 314 (MCL 38.1133).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 265 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 40 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 40 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0145'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/7/2016 @ 12:06 Pm |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/6/2016 @ 10:36 Pm |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 5/26/2016 @ 2:06 Pm |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-05-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-05-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-05-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 265 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2016-05-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-05-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-05-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Liability Reform |
2016-02-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-02-10 | House | Received On 02/10/2016 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 40 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darwin Booher |
Subjects
Legislature: reports
Retirement: pension oversight
State agencies (existing): technology, management, and budget
Retirement: pension oversight
State agencies (existing): technology, management, and budget