MI SB0744 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Ordered Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on September 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Ordered Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education: teachers and administrators; requirements for a teacher to successfully complete a probationary period: modify. Amends sec. 3b of 1937 (Ex Sess) PA 4 (MCL 38.83b).
Title
Education: teachers and administrators; requirements for a teacher to successfully complete a probationary period: modify. Amends sec. 3b of 1937 (Ex Sess) PA 4 (MCL 38.83b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 139 (Y: 56 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 66 (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 66 (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Postponed For The Day |
2024-05-22 | House | Returned To Senate |
2024-05-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 139 Yeas 56 Nays 47 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2024-05-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-05-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-05-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-05-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-05-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2024-03-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-03-19 | House | Received On 03/19/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 66 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kristen Mcdonald Rivet |