MI SB0796 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - For Final Disposition Of Budget, See S 801
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - For Final Disposition Of Budget, See S 801
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; school aid appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2016-2017. Amends secs. 11 & 17b of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1611 & 388.1617b).
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; school aid appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2016-2017. Amends secs. 11 & 17b of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1611 & 388.1617b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 274 (Y: 0 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 253 (Y: 69 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 250 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 253 (Y: 69 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 250 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | For Final Disposition Of Budget, See S 801 |
2016-05-25 | House | Rep. David Hildenbrand Replaced Rep. Phillip Pavlov As Conferee 05/25/2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Sen. David Hildenbrand Replaced Sen. Phillip Pavlov As Conferee 05/25/2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Referred To Conference Committee |
2016-05-24 | House | House Conferees Named 05/24/2016: Reps. Tim Kelly Phil Potvin Sarah Roberts |
2016-05-24 | House | Senate Conferees Named 05/24/2016: Sens. Goeff Hansen Phillip Pavlov Hoon-yung Hopgood |
2016-05-24 | House | Re-received From Senate With Notice Of Nonconcurrence In House Substitute H-1 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Named Conferees 05/24/2016: Sens. Goeff Hansen, Phillip Pavlov, Hoon-yung Hopgood |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Roll Call # 274 Yeas 0 Nays 37 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Nonconcurred In |
2016-05-10 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-05-10 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-05-10 | House | Passed Roll Call # 253 Yeas 69 Nays 39 |
2016-05-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-05-10 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-05-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-05-10 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-05-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-05-10 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2016-05-10 | House | Rule Suspended |
2016-05-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-05-10 | House | Received On 05/05/2016 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 250 Yeas 26 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Goeff Hansen |