MI SB0825 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0278'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0278'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for certain Michigan election law violations; enact. Amends sec. 11d, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.11d). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0823'11
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for certain Michigan election law violations; enact. Amends sec. 11d, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.11d). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0823'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 516 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 424 (Y: 68 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 69 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 424 (Y: 68 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 69 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0278'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/3/2012 @ 12:08 Pm |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/27/2012 @ 8:14 Pm |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/19/2012 @ 12:10 Pm |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-06-13 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 516 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-06-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-06-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 424 Yeas 68 Nays 42 |
2012-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-06-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-06-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-06-12 | House | Amended |
2012-06-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-02-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Redistricting And Elections |
2012-02-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-02-14 | House | Received On 02/14/2012 |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 69 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections |