MI SB0829 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; reference to section of the Michigan occupational safety and health act; amend to reflect repeal. Amends sec. 14b, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.14b). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0830'24
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; reference to section of the Michigan occupational safety and health act; amend to reflect repeal. Amends sec. 14b, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.14b). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0830'24
Sponsors
Sen. John Cherry [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 289 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Labor |
2024-06-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-06-26 | House | Received On 06/26/2024 |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 289 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Labor |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Cherry |
Same As/Similar To
SB0830 (Same As) 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Labor