MI SB0876 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Assigned Pa 0127'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Assigned Pa 0127'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; driver license; extension of renewal date for certain driver licenses during a declared emergency; provide for. Amends sec. 216, 226, 255, 301, 306, 306a, 309, 312f, 314 & 321c of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.216 et seq) & adds secs. 312k & 801k.
Title
Traffic control; driver license; extension of renewal date for certain driver licenses during a declared emergency; provide for. Amends sec. 216, 226, 255, 301, 306, 306a, 309, 312f, 314 & 321c of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.216 et seq) & adds secs. 312k & 801k.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 250 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 290 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 146 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 290 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 146 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0127'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/01/2020 01:48 Pm |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Approved By Governor 07/01/2020 11:00 Am |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Presented To Governor 06/30/2020 11:11 Am |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 250 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-25 | Senate | House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In |
2020-06-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-06-24 | House | Title Amended |
2020-06-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 290 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-06-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-06-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-06-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-06-24 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | Substitute (h-1) Not Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-06-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-05-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2020-05-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-05-19 | House | Received On 05/19/2020 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 146 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2020-04-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-04-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne A. Schmidt |